NY S01347 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-16 - LOST
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-16 - LOST
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various provisions relating to rent-to-own sales practices and disclosure requirements for rental-purchase agreements; requires that the termination of rent-to-own contracts not exceed five percent of the contract price; prohibits any merchant from assessing interest rates at a rate exceeding 25%.
Title
Makes various provisions relating to rent-to-own sales practices and disclosure requirements for rental-purchase agreements; requires that the termination of rent-to-own contracts not exceed five percent of the contract price; prohibits any merchant from assessing interest rates at a rate exceeding 25%.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | LOST | |
2009-07-16 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.902 | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-06-02 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2009-01-28 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A7746 (Same As) 2010-06-08 - held for consideration in judiciary