NY S01327 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - SIGNED CHAP.113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - SIGNED CHAP.113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain deadlines for voter registration; changes the amount of time required with respect to certain deadlines for voter registration procedures.
Title
Relates to certain deadlines for voter registration; changes the amount of time required with respect to certain deadlines for voter registration procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.113 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-03-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.104 |
2023-03-01 | Assembly | substituted for a972 |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2023-01-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-01-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.95 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00972 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - substituted by s1327