NY S01315 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits brewers with a certain annual volume and with a certain percentage of sales to terminate an agreement with a beer wholesaler without having good cause; requires payment of fair market value of the applicable distribution rights lost; allows for the arbitration panel to review the fair market value; sets forth definitions.
Title
Permits brewers with a certain annual volume and with a certain percentage of sales to terminate an agreement with a beer wholesaler without having good cause; requires payment of fair market value of the applicable distribution rights lost; allows for the arbitration panel to review the fair market value; sets forth definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.367 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-04-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-04-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.434 |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | substituted for a8962 |
2012-01-31 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2012-01-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-01-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.127 |
2012-01-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2011-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A00789 (Same As) 2011-03-29 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
A08962 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - substituted by s1315
A08962 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - substituted by s1315