NY S01301 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes family courts to order the local commissioner of social services to advise the employer of a respondent upon the disposition of a child protective proceeding where the respondent has contact with children in the course of his or her employment if there is a finding that the child was abused.
Title
Authorizes family courts to order the local commissioner of social services to advise the employer of a respondent upon the disposition of a child protective proceeding where the respondent has contact with children in the course of his or her employment if there is a finding that the child was abused.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2018-03-26 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1301A |
2018-03-26 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-26 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2018-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.127 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2017-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.188 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A10306 (Same As) 2018-05-11 - reference changed to children and families