NY S01257 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the residential-commercial exemption program to include any municipality regardless of the population of the county in which it is located.
Title
Expands the residential-commercial exemption program to include any municipality regardless of the population of the county in which it is located.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2016-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1289 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.131 |
2015-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03940 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to real property taxation