NY S01256 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires potable water testing at state and local parks at least once every three years and any finding of lead contamination must be abated within ninety days.
Title
Requires potable water testing at state and local parks at least once every three years and any finding of lead contamination must be abated within ninety days.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. John Mannion [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2022-04-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.586 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1256B |
2022-02-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-01-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.724 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1256A |
2021-04-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04551 (Same As) 2022-05-03 - reported referred to ways and means