NY S01194 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - VETOED MEMO.290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - VETOED MEMO.290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of moneys in the open space account of the environmental protection fund for the support of the Historic Hudson-Hoosic Rivers Partnership.
Title
Authorizes the use of moneys in the open space account of the environmental protection fund for the support of the Historic Hudson-Hoosic Rivers Partnership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-11 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.290 |
2015-11-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.525 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a5079 |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.860 |
2015-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05079 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s1194