NY S01193 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures ovarian cancer survivors have the right to access screenings for health conditions.
Title
Ensures ovarian cancer survivors have the right to access screenings for health conditions.
Sponsors
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. George Borrello [R] | Sen. Cordell Cleare [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] |
Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] | Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.829 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A07161 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to health