NY S01188 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates dog control officers in the city of Cohoes as peace officers when they are acting pursuant to their special duties.
Title
Designates dog control officers in the city of Cohoes as peace officers when they are acting pursuant to their special duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.42 |
2011-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.393 |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a3074 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1150 |
2011-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03074 (Same As) 2011-06-17 - substituted by s1188