NY S01112 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 1112A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 1112A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to fees charged for certain hunting, fishing and trapping licenses.
Title
Relates to fees charged for certain hunting, fishing and trapping licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1112A |
2014-01-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05516 (Same As) 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken