NY S01078 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - 2ND REPORT CAL.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to increasing fines for individuals who fail to comply with a stop work order; increases fines from $6,000 to $10,000 for initial violation and $12,000 to $20,000 for subsequent violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to increasing fines for individuals who fail to comply with a stop work order; increases fines from $6,000 to $10,000 for initial violation and $12,000 to $20,000 for subsequent violations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-01-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.135
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO CITIES
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.844
2019-01-10SenateREFERRED TO CITIES

Same As/Similar To

A01893 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to cities

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback