NY S01078 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4972A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4972A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the items which may be sold by a licensed farm cidery and the licensees to whom a farm cidery may sell its cider for resale.
Title
Expands the items which may be sold by a licensed farm cidery and the licensees to whom a farm cidery may sell its cider for resale.
Sponsors
Sen. David Valesky [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] |
Sen. James Seward [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4972A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1078A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-05 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2017-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.278 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A04972 (Same As) 2017-08-17 - signed chap.171