NY S01067 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A379
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A379
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to access to the special supplemental nutrition program for women, infants and children relating to specialty formula; relates to the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to access to the special supplemental nutrition program for women, infants and children relating to specialty formula; relates to the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A379 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.21 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00379 (Same As) 2017-03-15 - signed chap.12