NY S01032 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
Pending: Senate New York City Education Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
Pending: Senate New York City Education Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public schools in any city with a population over one million that have at least 25% of students practicing a religious faith with specific dietary restrictions to offer food options which meet such dietary restrictions.
Title
Requires public schools in any city with a population over one million that have at least 25% of students practicing a religious faith with specific dietary restrictions to offer food options which meet such dietary restrictions.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE |
2015-06-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2015-05-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE |
2015-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |