NY S01002 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employees of dealers in firearms to submit to state and national criminal background checks and sets forth procedures for employment certificates.
Title
Requires employees of dealers in firearms to submit to state and national criminal background checks and sets forth procedures for employment certificates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-08 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |