NY S00995 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens the scope of child abuse and neglected child to include proof of a positive controlled substance toxicology report on a newborn infant; presence of such controlled substances establishes a rebuttable presumption that the release of the infant to the parent presents an imminent danger to the child's health or life.
Title
Broadens the scope of child abuse and neglected child to include proof of a positive controlled substance toxicology report on a newborn infant; presence of such controlled substances establishes a rebuttable presumption that the release of the infant to the parent presents an imminent danger to the child's health or life.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A04991 (Same As) 2011-04-20 - enacting clause stricken
A09327 (Same As) 2012-02-16 - referred to children and families
A09327 (Same As) 2012-02-16 - referred to children and families