NY S00992 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the provision of translation services for inmates appearing before the parole board.
Title
Requires the provision of translation services for inmates appearing before the parole board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.14 |
2016-11-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.473 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.541 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a5548 |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1525 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2015-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05548 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s992