NY S00968 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring certain civil court documents to be provided to parties in their native language and requiring parties to demonstrate their understanding of the nature and effect of such documents.
Title
Relates to requiring certain civil court documents to be provided to parties in their native language and requiring parties to demonstrate their understanding of the nature and effect of such documents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.289 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.788 |
2023-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09151 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - referred to judiciary