NY S00958 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a solar powered trash compacting garbage receptacle pilot program whereby 100 garbage receptacles in certain parks will be replaced with solar powered trash compacting garbage receptacles once the commissioner of parks has received the proceeds from advertising space on such receptacles; establishes reporting requirements.
Title
Requires a solar powered trash compacting garbage receptacle pilot program whereby 100 garbage receptacles in certain parks will be replaced with solar powered trash compacting garbage receptacles once the commissioner of parks has received the proceeds from advertising space on such receptacles; establishes reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.41 |
2011-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.357 |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a302c |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1202 |
2011-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 958C |
2011-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2011-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 958B |
2011-02-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2011-02-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 958A |
2011-02-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00302 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - substituted by s958c