NY S00957 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-03 - PRINT NUMBER 957A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-03 - PRINT NUMBER 957A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the qualification of member items, discretionary funds and unitemized lump sum appropriations; authorizes the legislative ethics commission to review violations and requires that all be fully itemized; defines terms; establishes the executive community projects fund; makes related provisions.
Title
Clarifies the qualification of member items, discretionary funds and unitemized lump sum appropriations; authorizes the legislative ethics commission to review violations and requires that all be fully itemized; defines terms; establishes the executive community projects fund; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 957A |
2016-02-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05307 (Same As) 2016-02-01 - print number 5307a