NY S00957 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of radar and laser blocking devices in all motor vehicles.
Title
Prohibits the use of radar and laser blocking devices in all motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-02-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-02-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.110 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.26 |
2011-01-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |