NY S00955 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to venue for certain civil actions arising out of certain violations of the lien law and the vehicle and traffic law.
Title
Relates to venue for certain civil actions arising out of certain violations of the lien law and the vehicle and traffic law.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-04-25 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-03-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-02-22 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A01110 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to judiciary