NY S00951 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-01 - PRINT NUMBER 951B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-01 - PRINT NUMBER 951B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires fingerprinting of prospective employees of special education schools and special act school districts for purposes of a criminal background check; defines "special education school"; defines "special act school district"; and allows school to establish procedures for conditional appointment or emergency conditional appointment of prospective employees of the school.
Title
Requires fingerprinting of prospective employees of special education schools and special act school districts for purposes of a criminal background check; defines "special education school"; defines "special act school district"; and allows school to establish procedures for conditional appointment or emergency conditional appointment of prospective employees of the school.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | PRINT NUMBER 951B | |
2010-04-01 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | |
2009-04-21 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2009-04-17 | PRINT NUMBER 951A | |
2009-04-17 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION | |
2009-03-18 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION | |
2009-01-22 | REFERRED TO FINANCE |