NY S00944 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to proof of service to municipalities by applicants for certificates of environmental compatibility and public need relating to the construction of major utility transmission facilities; requires applicants to provide proof of service to municipalities within a one mile radius of where such facility is to be located.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to proof of service to municipalities by applicants for certificates of environmental compatibility and public need relating to the construction of major utility transmission facilities; requires applicants to provide proof of service to municipalities within a one mile radius of where such facility is to be located.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-02-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-02-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.396
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback