NY S00936 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes uniform waiting list priorities for domestic violence survivors applying for public housing.
Title
Establishes uniform waiting list priorities for domestic violence survivors applying for public housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2024-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1237 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-09 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2023-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-01-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.199 |
2023-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01113 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to housing