NY S00929 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 929A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 929A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to obligations with respect to contracts with business enterprises which employ individuals with disabilities; defines qualified business enterprise as any business concern which employs a workforce consisting of at least fifteen percent employees with disabilities and has been certified under this section; sets goal of five percent of state contracts going to qualified business enterprises; establishes an office of statewide advocate, certification process, and enforcement mechanism.
Title
Relates to obligations with respect to contracts with business enterprises which employ individuals with disabilities; defines qualified business enterprise as any business concern which employs a workforce consisting of at least fifteen percent employees with disabilities and has been certified under this section; sets goal of five percent of state contracts going to qualified business enterprises; establishes an office of statewide advocate, certification process, and enforcement mechanism.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Martin Golden [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 929A |
2018-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09629 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - referred to governmental operations