NY S00906 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2085A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2085A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain providers of health care policies to provide coverage for colorectal cancer early detection in accordance with the American cancer society guidelines; requires the insurance carriers to notify enrollees of such coverage and screening guidelines via mail.
Title
Requires certain providers of health care policies to provide coverage for colorectal cancer early detection in accordance with the American cancer society guidelines; requires the insurance carriers to notify enrollees of such coverage and screening guidelines via mail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2085A |
2022-05-24 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1489 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2021-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 906B |
2021-05-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2021-01-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 906A |
2021-01-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02085 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - approval memo.56