NY S00902 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A953
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A953
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting certain uses of trichloroethylene; provides that no person shall use trichloroethylene as a vapor degreaser, an intermediate chemical to produce other chemicals, a refrigerant, or an extraction solvent or in any other manufacturing or industrial cleaning process or use.
Title
Relates to prohibiting certain uses of trichloroethylene; provides that no person shall use trichloroethylene as a vapor degreaser, an intermediate chemical to produce other chemicals, a refrigerant, or an extraction solvent or in any other manufacturing or industrial cleaning process or use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A953 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.55 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00953 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - signed chap.1