NY S00897 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - PRINT NUMBER 897A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the climate corporate accountability act requiring certain business entities within the state to annually disclose scope one, scope two and scope three emissions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the climate corporate accountability act requiring certain business entities within the state to annually disclose scope one, scope two and scope three emissions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-23SenatePRINT NUMBER 897A
2023-05-23SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2023-05-22SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-01-09SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A04123 (Same As) 2023-09-01 - print number 4123a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback