NY A04123 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the climate corporate accountability act requiring certain business entities within the state to annually disclose scope one, scope two and scope three emissions.
Title
Establishes the climate corporate accountability act requiring certain business entities within the state to annually disclose scope one, scope two and scope three emissions.
Sponsors
Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Brian Cunningham [D] | Asm. Anna Kelles [D] | Asm. Dana Levenberg [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | print number 4123a |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00897 (Same As) 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE