NY S00897 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes gifts, on personal income tax returns, for substance use disorder education and recovery; establishes the substance use disorder education and recovery fund for the receipt and expenditure of monies from such gifts; directs the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services to provide grants to organizations engaged in activities dedicated to providing education, prevention, treatment or recovery to those suffering from substance use disorders.
Title
Authorizes gifts, on personal income tax returns, for substance use disorder education and recovery; establishes the substance use disorder education and recovery fund for the receipt and expenditure of monies from such gifts; directs the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services to provide grants to organizations engaged in activities dedicated to providing education, prevention, treatment or recovery to those suffering from substance use disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-02-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09857 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - REFERRED TO FINANCE