NY S00886 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4395
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4395
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes retired supreme court justices to serve as justice of supreme court until age 80; provides that judges of the court of appeals need not retire until the end of the year in which they turn age 80; prohibits the appointment of any person over age 70 to the court of appeals.
Title
Authorizes retired supreme court justices to serve as justice of supreme court until age 80; provides that judges of the court of appeals need not retire until the end of the year in which they turn age 80; prohibits the appointment of any person over age 70 to the court of appeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4395 |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1012 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-01-22 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2013-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 886A |
2013-01-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2013-01-11 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A04395 (Same As) 2013-06-26 - delivered to secretary of state