NY S00886 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits compensation based on home loan terms by mortgage brokers or mortgage lenders.
Title
Prohibits compensation based on home loan terms by mortgage brokers or mortgage lenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.404 |
2012-08-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.381 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7329 |
2012-03-21 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2012-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.314 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN |
2012-02-21 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A07329 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - substituted by s886