NY S00880 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the possession and sale of substances containing heroin in certain weights and packaging.
Title
Relates to the possession and sale of substances containing heroin in certain weights and packaging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.860 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1381 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09654 (Same As) 2018-01-30 - referred to codes