NY S00854 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - SIGNED CHAP.92
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "marihuana regulation and taxation act"; establishes the cannabis law; defines terms; establishes the New York state cannabis control board and the office of cannabis management; outlines powers and duties thereof; authorizes the lawful use of medical cannabis; authorizes research programs related thereto; establishes a cannabis research license to permit a licensee to produce, process, purchase and/or possess cannabis for certain limited research purposes; relates to adult-use cannabis; authorizes a person to apply for a license to cultivate, process, distribute, deliver or dispense cannabis for sale in this state; relates to the description of cannabis, and the growing of and use of cannabis by persons twenty-one years of age or older; makes technical changes regarding the definition of cannabis; relates to removing certain references to marijuana relating to forfeiture actions; relates to the qualification of certain offenses involving cannabis; exempts certain persons from prosecution for the use, consumption, display, production or distribution of cannabis; relates to the definition of smoking; provides for the licensure of persons authorized to produce, process and sell marihuana; relates to the criminal sale of cannabis; relates to drug paraphernalia; adds a new article on cannabis to the penal law; authorizes a motion for resentence for persons convicted of certain marihuana offenses; levies an excise tax on certain sales of cannabis; creates the New York state cannabis revenue fund, the New York state drug treatment and public education fund and the New York state community grants reinvestment fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "marihuana regulation and taxation act"; establishes the cannabis law; defines terms; establishes the New York state cannabis control board and the office of cannabis management; outlines powers and duties thereof; authorizes the lawful use of medical cannabis; authorizes research programs related thereto; establishes a cannabis research license to permit a licensee to produce, process, purchase and/or possess cannabis for certain limited research purposes; relates to adult-use cannabis; authorizes a person to apply for a license to cultivate, process, distribute, deliver or dispense cannabis for sale in this state; relates to the description of cannabis, and the growing of and use of cannabis by persons twenty-one years of age or older; makes technical changes regarding the definition of cannabis; relates to removing certain references to marijuana relating to forfeiture actions; relates to the qualification of certain offenses involving cannabis; exempts certain persons from prosecution for the use, consumption, display, production or distribution of cannabis; relates to the definition of smoking; provides for the licensure of persons authorized to produce, process and sell marihuana; relates to the criminal sale of cannabis; relates to drug paraphernalia; adds a new article on cannabis to the penal law; authorizes a motion for resentence for persons convicted of certain marihuana offenses; levies an excise tax on certain sales of cannabis; creates the New York state cannabis revenue fund, the New York state drug treatment and public education fund and the New York state community grants reinvestment fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31AssemblySIGNED CHAP.92
2021-03-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2021-03-30Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-03-30Assemblypassed assembly
2021-03-30Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.46
2021-03-30Assemblysubstituted for a1248a
2021-03-30Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2021-03-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-03-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-03-30SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.641
2021-03-30SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-03-27SenatePRINT NUMBER 854A
2021-03-27SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A01248 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - substituted by s854a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback