NY S00841 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A989
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A989
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to minority and women-owned business enterprise fraud and the monies of the minority and women-owned business enterprise fund; and to the effectiveness of certain provisions related thereto.
Title
Relates to minority and women-owned business enterprise fraud and the monies of the minority and women-owned business enterprise fund; and to the effectiveness of certain provisions related thereto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A989 |
2023-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.50 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00989 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - signed chap.40