NY A00989 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to minority and women-owned business enterprise fraud and the monies of the minority and women-owned business enterprise fund; and to the effectiveness of certain provisions related thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to minority and women-owned business enterprise fraud and the monies of the minority and women-owned business enterprise fund; and to the effectiveness of certain provisions related thereto.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-03Assemblysigned chap.40
2023-03-03Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-01-24SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-01-24SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-01-24Senate3RD READING CAL.50
2023-01-24SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S841
2023-01-23SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-01-23Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-01-23Assemblypassed assembly
2023-01-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.36
2023-01-18Assemblyrules report cal.36
2023-01-18Assemblyreported
2023-01-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-01-18Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-01-11Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S00841 (Same As) 2023-01-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A989

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A989
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00989&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00989
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00989&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00989&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00989&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00989&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A989#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback