NY S00836 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for patient prescription pricing transparency; requires certain insurers or pharmacy benefit managers to furnish required cost, benefit and coverage data upon request of the insured, the insured's health care provider or an authorized third party.
Title
Provides for patient prescription pricing transparency; requires certain insurers or pharmacy benefit managers to furnish required cost, benefit and coverage data upon request of the insured, the insured's health care provider or an authorized third party.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2200 |
2023-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.45 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02200 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - signed chap.63