NY S00830 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - APPROVAL MEMO.6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to voting and registration for voting by formerly incarcerated individuals convicted of a felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to voting and registration for voting by formerly incarcerated individuals convicted of a felony.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.6
2021-05-04AssemblySIGNED CHAP.103
2021-04-22SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2021-04-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-04-21Assemblypassed assembly
2021-03-10Assemblyordered to third reading cal.147
2021-03-10Assemblysubstituted for a4448a
2021-02-24Assemblyreferred to election law
2021-02-24SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-02-24SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-02-22SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.368
2021-02-22SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-02-21SenatePRINT NUMBER 830B
2021-02-21SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2021-02-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2021-01-20SenatePRINT NUMBER 830A
2021-01-20SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A04448 (Same As) 2021-03-10 - substituted by s830b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S830
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00830&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00830
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00830&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00830A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00830&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00830B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S830#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S830#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S830#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00830&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback