NY S00818 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts the effective date of the John R. Lewis Voting Rights Act of New York to July 1, 2023.
Title
Adjusts the effective date of the John R. Lewis Voting Rights Act of New York to July 1, 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.169 |
2023-06-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.422 |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | substituted for a7431 |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2023-02-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-02-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.27 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07431 (Same As) 2023-05-31 - substituted by s818