NY S00817 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax credit for the removal or permanent enclosure of a residential fuel oil storage tank.
Title
Establishes a tax credit for the removal or permanent enclosure of a residential fuel oil storage tank.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-06-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00513 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means