NY S00785 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the month of May as elder appreciation month.
Title
Designates the month of May as elder appreciation month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.571 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-05-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.399 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05014 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to governmental operations
S00785 (Same As) 2016-05-04 - referred to governmental operations
S00785 (Same As) 2016-05-04 - referred to governmental operations