NY S00783 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs that a certain annual service fee of twenty-five dollars between the custodial and noncustodial parent be evenly distributed.
Title
Directs that a certain annual service fee of twenty-five dollars between the custodial and noncustodial parent be evenly distributed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2013-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.409 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A00139 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to social services