NY S00767 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes minors who are 14 or older and are active members of a religious community to engage or assist in employment which such minors are otherwise prohibited from performing; requires such minors to be supervised by an adult member of such religious community.
Title
Authorizes minors who are 14 or older and are active members of a religious community to engage or assist in employment which such minors are otherwise prohibited from performing; requires such minors to be supervised by an adult member of such religious community.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2012-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-01-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-01-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.41 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2011-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.117 |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A06082 (Same As) 2012-06-06 - held for consideration in labor