NY S00767 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - PRINT NUMBER 767B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - PRINT NUMBER 767B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes licensed authorized organizations to conduct certain poker tournaments as licensed games of chance fund-raisers.
Title
Authorizes licensed authorized organizations to conduct certain poker tournaments as licensed games of chance fund-raisers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | PRINT NUMBER 767B | |
2010-06-22 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | |
2009-06-15 | PRINT NUMBER 767A | |
2009-06-15 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-28 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-01-15 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08832 (Same As) 2010-06-23 - print number 8832a