NY S00762 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the location and layout of premises of licensed retailers.
Title
Provides for the location and layout of premises of licensed retailers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.428 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |