NY S00738 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-11 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-11 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows board of education to provide transportation to school for a child living a lesser distance than two miles from school if the parent or guardian of the child has a physically limiting impairment and is unable to accompany the child to and from school.
Title
Allows board of education to provide transportation to school for a child living a lesser distance than two miles from school if the parent or guardian of the child has a physically limiting impairment and is unable to accompany the child to and from school.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Fuschillo [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-04-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.302 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |