NY S00692 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to contracts by the New York City school construction authority; provides that a bid shall not be rejected or be deemed invalid, impaired or in any manner defective solely for harmless, technical, or ministerial defects, where the intent is clearly discernible and unintentional, provided, however, that this section shall not be deemed to relieve any bidder from any criminal or civil liability as may be imposed by reason of his or her act, nor enlarge the actual authority of any officer of the authority, nor, except as stated in this sentence, limit any other statute or rule of law.
Title
Relates to contracts by the New York City school construction authority; provides that a bid shall not be rejected or be deemed invalid, impaired or in any manner defective solely for harmless, technical, or ministerial defects, where the intent is clearly discernible and unintentional, provided, however, that this section shall not be deemed to relieve any bidder from any criminal or civil liability as may be imposed by reason of his or her act, nor enlarge the actual authority of any officer of the authority, nor, except as stated in this sentence, limit any other statute or rule of law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2016-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.99 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-05-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.127 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04090 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions