NY S00691 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 691A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 691A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that people arrested in connection with a felony must submit a DNA sample.
Title
Provides that people arrested in connection with a felony must submit a DNA sample.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 691A |
2012-01-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01978 (Same As) 2012-01-31 - print number 1978a