NY S00627 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Regulates the sale of methamphetamine precursor drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulates the sale of methamphetamine precursor drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-02Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2016-03-02SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2016-03-02SenatePASSED SENATE
2016-02-24SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.214
2016-02-24SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2016-01-06SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2016-01-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2016-01-06Assemblydied in assembly
2015-06-10Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2015-06-10SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2015-06-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2015-06-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2015-06-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2015-05-28Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1030
2015-01-07SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A00468 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to consumer affairs and protection

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback